Financial history THE KELSEY TRUST

Charity Number: 1121163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £17.94k £18.95k £23.05k £19.37k £20.13k
Total expenditure £10.33k £30.60k £30.16k £29.76k £22.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A