THE ZAKAT RELIEF FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Buy and deliver blankets, tents, medicines and similar items to areas suffering from natural disasters. To provide cooked meals, basic clothing and similar items to poor living in cities and villages. Payments of funds into orphanges to assist with looking after the vulnerable. Provision of funding to areas suffering hardship by contributing to the construction and running of hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- India
- Malawi
- Mali
- Nepal
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Somalia
Governance
- 03 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
rizwan Javed | Trustee |
|
||||||
MUHAMMED ASLAM ALAM NOMANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Naseer Javed | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sonia Javed | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.68k | £112.35k | £108.85k | £114.75k | £118.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.13k | £112.30k | £107.90k | £116.17k | £118.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEEDS AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER SUITABLE MEANS) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES. B) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS. C) THE RELIEF OF FINICAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH BASIC GOODS AND SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. D) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. E) THE RELIEF OF THE SICK/POOR LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. F) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
IN ANY PART OF, OR ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. IN PRACTICE: WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 CHURCH ROAD
EDGBASTON
BIRMINGHAM
B15 3SR
- Phone:
- 01216877000
- Email:
- rizwanjaved@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window