Financial history MERSTHAM COMMUNITY FACILITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1121420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £112.71k £218.41k £253.78k £159.65k £212.59k
Total expenditure £115.14k £157.10k £172.93k £186.49k £233.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.00k N/A N/A £7.25k