PEBBLES PROJECT UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pebbles Project aims to enable children from agricultural communities in the Western Cape of South Africa to reach their full potential by offering a range of educational, health, nutrition, community and protection programmes and services. Pebbles supports children from conception through to young adulthood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- South Africa
Governance
- 12 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WAINWRIGHT | Trustee | 28 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIA WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAY ALEXANDER ABERCROMBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH CLIFTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.43k | £151.42k | £145.02k | £262.23k | £274.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.64k | £144.32k | £154.53k | £263.25k | £225.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 January 2025 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 January 2025 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 January 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 12 January 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 January 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 21 January 2021 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF ALL RACE GROUPS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 2 YEARS AND 12 YEARS WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OR WHOSE LIVES ARE AFFECTED BY ALCOHOL IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR PARENTS, CRECHE WORKERS AND PRIMARY SCHOOL TEACHERS WHO WILL BE WORKING WITH SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fion Howe
Edge Lane
HENLEY-IN-ARDEN
B95 5DS
- Phone:
- +44 7753 740834
- Email:
- ray.abercromby@azets.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window