Financial history ELEPHANTS FOR AFRICA

Charity Number: 1122027
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £41.17k £53.73k £45.51k £77.10k £54.92k
Total expenditure £60.31k £70.50k £62.98k £69.62k £60.93k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A