THE OXFORD MINDFULNESS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The OMC works: 1. on high-level academic research into achieving psychological balance through mindfulness (as recommended, e.g. by NICE for depression); 2. on academically rigorous application of those practices in therapy, CPD etc; 3. on training others to research and apply those practices; and specifically 4. on promoting and administering such activity in Oxford University.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£948,609
Donations and legacies | £25.07k | |
Charitable activities | £919.76k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.78k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,002,571
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.00m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.00m |
People

10 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Belgium
- Brazil
- China
- Czech Republic
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Japan
- Mexico
- Norway
- Taiwan
Governance
- 30 January 2008: Standard registration
- OXFORD MINDFULNESS CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE OXFORD MINDFULNESS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC PETER YIANGOU | Chair | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Herrmann | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Keairns | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Schell-Beelitz | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Makeda Nastasen McKenzie | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Ford | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Matilde Elices | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DYLAN ALEXANDER SCHLOSBERG | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £670.40k | £811.14k | £1.12m | £1.15m | £948.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £878.82k | £785.91k | £1.06m | £1.14m | £1.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £3.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.32k | £71.30k | £55.12k | £35.40k | £25.07k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £641.85k | £739.42k | £1.06m | £1.12m | £919.76k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.22k | £416 | £2.21k | £516 | £3.78k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £878.82k | £785.91k | £1.06m | £1.14m | £1.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.04k | £32.94k | £0 | £0 | £27.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.14k | £643 | £1.99k | £3.66k | £2.67k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £527.07k | £779.84k | £959.58k | £782.26k | £767.21k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £229.29k | £456.35k | £579.17k | £388.83k | £426.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION): (A) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO (1) PREVENTING MENTAL ILL HEALTH AND ENHANCING HUMAN FLOURISHING ACROSS THE LIFESPAN AND (2) REDUCING SUFFERING, PROMOTING RESILIENCE AND THE REALISATION OF HUMAN POTENTIAL ACROSS THE LIFESPAN THROUGH MINDFULNESS AND MINDFUL BEHAVIOURS; AND/OR (B) TRAINING MENTAL HEALTH PRACTITIONERS, OTHER PROFESSIONALS AND SUITABLY ASSESSED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN MINDFULNESS PRACTICE WITH A VIEW TO THEM APPLYING IT IN THEIR OWN PROFESSIONAL LIVES SO AS TO ACHIEVE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: • TEACHING IT TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND/ OR • COMMUNICATING WITH MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC THE IMPACT OF MINDFULNESS AND MINDFUL BEHAVIOURS AND/ OR • ENHANCING EFFECTIVE ETHICAL PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE IN ORGANISATIONS IN THE RESPECT OF MANAGEMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH; AND/OR • COLLABORATING INTERNATIONALLY TO SUPPORT PROFESSIONAL SERVICES FOR USERS OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES; AND/OR (C) SUPPORTING / COLLABORATING WITH TEACHING, TRAINING AND RESEARCH ACTIVITIES IN MINDFULNESS STUDIES UNDERTAKEN AT THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD AND OTHER UNIVERSITIES INTERNATIONALLY; AND/OR (D) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS. 4.2 THE CHARITY IS NOT ESTABLISHED OR CONDUCTED FOR PRIVATE GAIN: ALL PROFIT AND ASSETS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE USED, BY WAY OF REINVESTMENT OR OTHERWISE, PRINCIPALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oxford Mindfulness Foundation
The Wheelhouse
Angel Court
81 St Clements
Oxford
OX4 1AW
- Phone:
- 01865238568
- Email:
- admin@oxfordmindfulness.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window