OLDHAM ATHLETIC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ur current activity of delivering coaching within schools, holiday activities and developing a wide range of initiatives and programs around inclusion, community cohesion, health, supporting the grassroots game, provision of opportunities for girls, women and disabled players and coaches as well as using football combined with educational activity to address a range of social issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
- Oldham
- Tameside
Governance
- 18 September 2007: Standard registration
- OLDHAM ATHLETIC COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Jeffery Royales | Chair | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donna Worthington | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Howard | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Young | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Henry Bell | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Belfield | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tansy Louise Jones | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £291.50k | £256.92k | £514.79k | £500.75k | £492.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.02k | £236.36k | £449.81k | £424.69k | £485.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.84k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £255.33k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £514.79k | £245.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.02k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £449.81k | £424.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.92k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- (A) TO FURTHER AND ASSIST IN THE EDUCATION (ON A SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL BASIS) OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITHIN OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION, TAMESIDE) WITHOUT REFERENCE TO RACE, RELIGION AND BELIEF, SEX, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGIN OR SOCIAL BACKGROUND THROUGH THE USE OF THE GAME OF FOOTBALL (INCLUDING ITS HISTORY AND RULES) AND OTHER ANCILLARY SPORTING ACTIVITIES AS EDUCATIONAL TOOLS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT TO PROVIDE IN OLDHAM AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA FACILITIES FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ADULTS. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC OF OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION TAMESIDE) WITHOUT REFERENCE TO RACE, RELIGION AND BELIEF, SEX, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGIN OR SOCIAL BACKGROUND, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS, INCLUDING TAMESIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOUNDARY PARK
FURTHERWOOD ROAD
OLDHAM
OL1 2PA
- Phone:
- 01616244972
- Email:
- info@oldhamathletic.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window