NORTHERN ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Taking in and caring for dogs Rehoming them Fundraising to enable the above
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Hodgson | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Pike | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ROY TURVEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.37k | £35.73k | £21.24k | £143.87k | £82.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.71k | £34.17k | £22.01k | £35.23k | £47.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2024 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2021 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2021 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS NAMELY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE BREED KNOWN AS ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND, WALES, SCOTLAND, IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNNYSIDE
THE LEE
LONGFRAMLINGTON
MORPETH
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE65 8JL
- Phone:
- 01665570400
- Email:
- turvey.graham@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window