AREM FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the promotion and preservation of the good health of women and children in Africa and worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Uganda
Governance
- 28 August 2007: Standard registration
- 17 October 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.52k | £115.76k | £93 | £59 | £25 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.12k | £185.35k | £32.11k | £32.64k | £28.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 24 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 09 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE GOOD HEALTH OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN AFRICA AND WORLDWIDE
Area of benefit
AFRICA AND WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window