OPERATION HERNIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of surgery, surgical equipment, surgical facilities, practical advice and education to persons affected by groin and abdominal hernias in Africa and other low-income countries. The teaching of groin hernia surgery to practitioners usually treating such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ecuador
- Ghana
- Ivory Coast
- Mongolia
- Nigeria
Governance
- 26 September 2007: Standard registration
- 07 August 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 August 2012: Funds transferred to 1138936 OPERATION HERNIA
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.70k | £26.50k | £40.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.00k | £26.09k | £13.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 31 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 08 March 2012 | 129 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 29 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 06 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 28 February 2010 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 18 August 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY GROIN AND ABDOMINAL HERNIAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SURGICAL OPERATIONS, SURGICAL EQUIPMENT, SURGICAL FACILITIES, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND EDUCATION TO THOSE PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE SUBCONTINENT OF AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window