CROYDON COMMITMENT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BROKERAGE OF CORPORATE SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY VOLUNTEERING AND ASSISTING WITH FUNDRAISING FOR OTHER LOCAL CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £17,807 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 19 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs K Glass | Chair | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Biley | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shanaaz Carroll | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Affi Khan | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Jackson | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Pamela Goodridge | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN PALMER | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Chillman | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Toni Letts | Trustee | 10 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.72k | £29.11k | £89.00k | £27.73k | £68.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.97k | £31.90k | £39.75k | £45.18k | £54.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.18k | £385 | N/A | £17.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED 12 FEBRUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN CROYDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THE CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mott MacDonald Group Ltd
8-10 Sydenham Road
Croydon
CR0 2EE
- Phone:
- 02087743680
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window