Trustees CROYDON COMMITMENT LTD
Charity number: 1122878

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs K Glass | Chair | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Biley | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shanaaz Carroll | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Affi Khan | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Jackson | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Pamela Goodridge | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN PALMER | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Chillman | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Toni Letts | Trustee | 10 August 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.