Financial history SURREY ASSOCIATION FOR VISUAL IMPAIRMENT

Charity number: 1121949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.45m £2.66m £2.46m £2.90m £3.32m
Total expenditure £2.47m £2.34m £2.48m £2.79m £3.19m
Income from government contracts £1.51m £1.55m £1.82m £1.86m £2.06m
Income from government grants £4.67k £214.78k £64.80k £30.00k £49.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £335.56k £895.45k £331.28k £413.93k £674.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £15.40k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.86m £1.74m £2.06m £2.39m £2.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.86k £13.45k £15.28k £23.84k £48.96k
Income - Other £233.39k £12.29k £54.50k £51.39k £100.03k
Income - Legacies £70.98k £122.19k £3.25k £15.50k £273.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.36m £2.24m £1.79m £2.76m £3.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £115.14k £106.71k £213.61k £24.99k £42.66k
Expenditure - Governance £11.23k £11.97k £21.97k £19.57k £13.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £6.38k £6.23k £0 £7.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £478.45k £8.12k £0