Trustees SURREY ASSOCIATION FOR VISUAL IMPAIRMENT
Charity number: 1121949

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE WILMSHURST | Chair | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adam Scarrott | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Halliday | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Liversidge | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Green | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grant Lewis | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penny Anne Gunn | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Da-Silva-Skinner | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN WHERRY | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL GILMORE | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BOB TURNBULL | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.