Trustees THE COMPANY OF ARTS SCHOLARS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1121954

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Emily Gough | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Willenbruch | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mary Theresa Munday | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL VINEY | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
HILLARY BAUER OBE | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hinchcliffe Aydon | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LESLIE BARBER | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.