BREAK FORTH INTERNATIONAL CHURCH, DAVIES M. MULENGA MINISTRIES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Break Forth International Church is a global ministry and a multi-racial international Church sent to obey the Great Commision by going into all the world to preach and teach the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ in this Generation. We are an independent Pentecostal Christian Church breaking forth for the advancement of Christian faith, education and charitable community support worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- Congo
- Germany
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TAFREY JAMU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
UTA NICOLE MULENGA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVIES MWILA MULENGA PHD CENG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51k | £1.55k | £2.25k | £2.50k | £2.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £1.55k | £2.25k | £2.50k | £2.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 8 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 30 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
1 TO BE A MULTI-RACIAL AND INTERNATIONAL CHURCH BREAKING FORTH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK AND TO ALL NATIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN CLAUSE 8 HERETO AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. 2 TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO PERSONS WHO HAVE A CHARITABLE NEED SUCH AS THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR THOSE WHO ARE SICK; ETC. 3 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3A THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER OF DISABILITY; 3B ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; AND 3C PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS. 4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE DIRECTORS (REFERRED TO AS TRUSTEES HEREAFTER) SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
UK AND ALL NATIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 ST. DENIS ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B29 4LW
- Phone:
- 01214767087
- Email:
- dr.dmulenga@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window