Financial history FRIENDS OF YOUNG CARERS (BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET)

Charity number: 1124809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £15.67k £1.59k £10.58k £10.56k £6.12k
Total expenditure £18.86k £4.83k £7.41k £15.81k £14.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A