Trustees MESH COMMUNITY COHESION SERVICES

Charity number: 1121249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ben McGarry Chair 18 May 2018
None on record
Martyna Oledrzynska Trustee 05 August 2024
None on record
Elinor Mary Harman Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Jo Buchanan Trustee 10 January 2020
None on record
Dr Carol Stephanie Borrill Trustee 12 November 2014
None on record