Financial history INTER CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1122887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £113.17k £70.31k £87.68k £60.41k £54.14k
Total expenditure £53.60k £10.59k £54.48k £80.19k £93.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A