Accounts and annual returns Resurrection Power And Living Bread Ministries (London)
Charity Number: 1120871

Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 February 2024 | 485 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 February 2024 | 485 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 November 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 November 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window