Accounts and annual returns LAKEVIEW MONKEY SANCTUARY LTD

Charity Number: 1120919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 24 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 August 2024 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 09 June 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 June 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required