Financial history THE HERBERT HOWELLS TRUST

Charity number: 1121065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.20k £34.35k £27.26k £30.59k £33.44k
Total expenditure £29.53k £27.71k £42.23k £36.61k £32.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A