DOCTORS WITH A MISSION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pressing the Limits - Offering free medical aid. Work alongside other medical groups in combatting epidemics in Africa. Work alongside churches in fulfillment of our goal to care for body and soul. Educating patients on preventative medicines. Organising medical missions for students. Serving the Nations - Healthcare Services Hospitals. Befriend a village special projects. Blindness prevention
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Angola
- China
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Philippines
- Sudan
- Tanzania
Governance
- 10 October 2007: Standard registration
- 23 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.55k | £478.73k | £175.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.28k | £654.22k | £144.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 15 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 24 March 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RACE, RELIGION, NATIONALITY OR ETHNIC ORIGIN IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER, MEDICINES AND OTHER RELIEF; B) TO PROMOTE OR FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS - IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window