YORK HOUSE CENTRE (STONY STRATFORD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Youth, Community and Arts Centre providing facilties for the recreation of the inhabitants of Stony Stratford and its environs. We offer rooms for hire - a hall, an additional ground floor activity/function room, further meeting rooms and a rehearsal studio. Our 2 Youth Clubs cater for ages 8 to 18. We have a Community Gardens Project in our rear grounds and also run community arts events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 08 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Charles Daniels | Chair | 20 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bull | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Hulme | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Louise Taylor | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deryck Morris Tucker | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RATCLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.71k | £79.56k | £86.48k | £106.58k | £111.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.39k | £66.39k | £96.46k | £110.77k | £115.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £990 | £40.61k | £12.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF STONY STRATFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"). B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY IN THE ARTS, FOR THOSE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
YORK HOUSE CENTRE
LONDON ROAD
STONY STRATFORD
MILTON KEYNES
MK11 1JQ
- Phone:
- 01908561075
- Email:
- info@york-house.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window