Trustees YORK HOUSE CENTRE (STONY STRATFORD)
Charity number: 1122220

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Charles Daniels | Chair | 20 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bull | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Hulme | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Louise Taylor | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deryck Morris Tucker | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RATCLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.