KEHAL CHASIDEI WIZNITZ LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION AND EDUCATION GENERALLY. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, OLD AGE ILLNESS, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISABILITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 20 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOSHE HERSH KAHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JONAH ARBARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.28k | £351.81k | £382.50k | £359.65k | £476.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £461.44k | £325.38k | £413.25k | £362.29k | £477.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 July 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 July 2020 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
94 Stamford Hill
London
N16 6XS
- Phone:
- 02082118118
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window