KPC YOUTH AND COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KPC Youth & Community offers a wide range of diversionary activities, advice, information and support for young people aged 8 - 25 years. KPC also offers accredited training via Agored Cymru etc, to help young people access better opportunities in life. The charity also works with our wider community through the provision of support for unemployment, digital upskilling, and other activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,039 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
Governance
- 27 March 2008: Standard registration
- KPC (Working name)
- KENFIG HILL, PYLE & CORNELLY (Previous name)
- KENFIG HILL, PYLE & CORNELLY YOUTH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA LUNNON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anthony Hughes | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Glyn Wallen | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD PAUL WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.78k | £139.51k | £119.68k | £107.68k | £69.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.18k | £145.86k | £122.45k | £128.43k | £94.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £26.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £3.00k | £35.14k | £32.40k | £4.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED CARDIFF, 15 MAY 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE CYNFFIG AND WIDER AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF BRIDGEND AND SURROUNDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING. TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. THE PREVENTION OF YOUTH CRIME, DRUG AND ALCOHOL MISUSE, WITHIN THE CYNFFIG AREA AND WIDER AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF BRIDGEND AND SURROUNDS, BY THE PROVISION OF A WIDE RANGE OF DIVERSIONARY ACTIVITIES, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF CYNFFIG AND WIDER ARE OF THE BOROUGH OF BRIDGEND AND SURROUNDS, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY THROUGH TRAINING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
CYNFFIG, AND WIDER BOROUGH OF BRIDGEND
Contact information
- Address:
-
OFF PYLE INN WAY
PYLE
BRIDGEND
CF33 6AB
- Phone:
- 01656749219
- Email:
- info@kpcyouth.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window