Cement Fields

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts presentations in North Kent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 29 January 2008: Standard registration
- WHITSTABLE BIENNALE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steffi Klenz | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CJ Mitchell | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lewandowski | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Brockless | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Hyslop | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Triscott | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £433.75k | £593.35k | £402.70k | £314.44k | £410.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.40k | £296.61k | £590.33k | £515.86k | £397.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £35.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £157.78k | £381.92k | £244.42k | £311.73k | £500 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £593.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £296.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JUNE 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 APR 2018 as amended on 28 Aug 2019 as amended on 25 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ARTS AND EDUCATION PROJECTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ARTS PRESENTATIONS IN NORTH KENT AND SURROUNDING AREA THE PROMOTION OF ALL FORMS OF ARTISTIC ACTIVITIES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO EXHIBITIONS OF ALL FORMS OF ART PERFORMANCE IN THE AREAS OF DRAMA MUSIC VISUAL ARTS DANCE FILM VIDEO PERFORMANCE AND LITERATURE AND THE PROVISION OF TEACHING TRAINING AND ADVICE IN SUCH AREAS THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES INFORMATION AND TEACHING FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES RELATED TO THE ABOVE OR OF ANY OTHER KIND AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WHITSTABLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 145
Dragon Coworking
7-8 New Road Avenue
CHATHAM
Kent
- Phone:
- 0198 723 8249
- Email:
- info@cementfields.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window