Accounts and annual returns HUNTS BREATHE FOR LIFE

Charity number: 1122152
Charity reporting is overdue by 1476 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 380 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 380 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 746 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 746 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1111 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1111 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1476 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1476 days