Financial history LIVESTOCK

Charity number: 1122091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.70k £39.32k £34.60k £49.42k £52.56k
Total expenditure £40.69k £28.03k £39.89k £44.14k £48.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.36k N/A £8.73k £24.50k £5.00k