Financial history STEVE PRESCOTT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1121395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £306.55k £200.36k £221.85k £198.43k £187.38k
Total expenditure £304.38k £195.35k £230.76k £214.84k £188.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A