JOSEPH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
Governance
- 06 December 2007: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 July 2012: Re-registered
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 August 2014: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZOE MUKORO-DIBIE | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.01k | £1.23k | £1.10k | £16.50k | £17.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.27k | £1.16k | £1.03k | £16.80k | £16.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 04 February 2025 | 676 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 June 2022 | 454 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. C) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 24
Poullett House
175 Tulse Hill
London
SW2 3DB
- Phone:
- 07951952814
- Email:
- josephministries@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window