Accounts and annual returns DISABILITY ADVOCACY SERVICES LTD

Charity Number: 1121991
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 06 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 04 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2009 03 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required