THE CRISPA (RICHARD CAHN) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees shall hold the capital and income of the Trust Fund upon trust to apply the income, and all or such part or parts of the capital, at such time or times and in such manner to, or for the benefit of, such exclusively charitable objects and purposes in any part of the world as the Trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIRANDA LOUISE RIJKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIETTE VERONICA SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIETTA RENATA HELENA CAHN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.93k | £85.17k | £96.18k | £128.75k | £116.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.37k | £163.01k | £160.44k | £137.49k | £135.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OF PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 2 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY INVESTMENTS AUTHORISED BY THIS DEED OR BY LAW AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
46 Egerton Gardens
London
SW3 2BZ
- Phone:
- 01903 740879
- Email:
- spofforthsec@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window