THE SEAWALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DONATIONS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 June 2008: Standard registration
- THE SEWALL TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER CHIPPERFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
kate louise chipperfield | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILES WILLIAM THOMAS CHIPPERFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.67k | £7.42k | £9.17k | £10.03k | £11.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78 | £10.00k | £5.05k | £7.90k | £11.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FOUND AND MAY ALSO TRANSFER PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FOUND TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 CRIEFF ROAD
LONDON
SW18 2EA
- Phone:
- 07855744202
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window