THE AMECA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity establishes medical and educational training facilities in African countries; it establishes bursary awards and medical placements for UK medical students in African medical communities; it provides travel bursaries for UK school leavers to participate in recognised voluntary projects in African countries and it supports medical training in African Countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Malawi
Governance
- 16 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Margaret Mary Butler | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tony Redshaw | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roderick Spensley Thomas | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE FREEDBERG | Trustee | 29 August 2007 |
|
|
||||
BETTIE RUTH MARKUS | Trustee | 29 August 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.43k | £62.50k | £99.93k | £77.37k | £150.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.60k | £96.92k | £83.81k | £72.42k | £103.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 AUGUST 2007 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 22 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT INCLUDING ESTABLISHING (OR ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF) MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES TO IMPROVE THE TRAINING OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN AFRICA AND IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN HEALTH CARE ISSUES
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 WOODLANDS ROAD
EPSOM
KT18 7HP
- Phone:
- 07946606107
- Email:
- ameca@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window