THE LEAP EQUINE THERAPUTIC CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing programmes for therapeutic interventions in specific areas, including: Young Offenders,Women at Risk,Trauma & Post Traumatic Stress Disorder, Vulnerable Adolescents,Learning Difficulties, Autistic Spectrum, Addiction. Please referrer to our annual report for an in depth overview of our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 February 2008: Standard registration
- 04 July 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.23k | £61.74k | £61.29k | £60.72k | £392 | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.88k | £56.51k | £62.88k | £59.52k | £17.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 01 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 13 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 13 August 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 03 October 2011 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 05 September 2011 | 5 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF TREATING PEOPLE AND HORSES SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL, BEHAVIOURAL, EMOTIONAL AND RELATED HEALTH PROBLEMSTHROUGH EQUINE ASSISTED THERAPY AND TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE TECHNIQUES AND HEALTH BENEFITS OF EQUINE ASSISTED THERAPY TO SOCIAL AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS AN EFFECTIVE TREATMENT OF PEOPLE AND HORSES SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, BEHAVIOURAL, EMOTIONAL AND RELATED HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH IN AND PUBLISHING EDUCATIONAL LITERATURE ABOUT EQUINE ASSISTED THERAPY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window