Financial history PRESTON COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1132069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £10.39k £7.96k £2.25k £6.58k £9.14k
Total expenditure £8.55k £8.28k £4.79k £7.64k £8.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A