Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM J. CLINTON FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1123171
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 February 2017 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 03 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 03 December 2014 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 03 December 2014 33 days late