Financial history CENTRAL YOUTH THEATRE

Charity number: 1130961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £80.98k £91.28k £119.17k £94.94k £131.95k
Total expenditure £84.98k £61.26k £120.82k £101.11k £160.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £37.59k £29.69k £1.75k £41.14k