Trustees CENTRAL YOUTH THEATRE
Charity number: 1130961

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roseanna Baggott | Chair | 16 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Bryn Mills | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Harrison | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Crowley | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raman Sarpal | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dion Fanthom | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Poole | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Rooney | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ANN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSIE KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.