ANIMAL PROTECTION AGENCY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Animal Protection Agency Foundation carries out research into the impacts of the wildlife trade on individual animals, biodiversity and the natural environment, as well as the risks of infectious disease transmission between wildlife and people. The Foundation conducts awareness raising programmes on all issues concerning the trade in wild animals as pets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Mae Sweet | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Cameron Hay | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA LEIGH REDDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN ROBERT HUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.85k | £2.20k | £5.26k | £8.29k | £12.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.71k | £6.24k | £3.55k | £11.83k | £10.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5TH APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. (3) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. (4) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO THE RISK OF INFECTIOUS DISEASE TRANSMISSION BETWEEN ANIMALS AND HUMANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Werk Central
15-17 Middle Street
BRIGHTON
BN1 1AL
- Phone:
- 01273674253
- Email:
- info@apa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window