RESTORATION FROM HIV/AIDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDED FOOD SUPPLIES TO FAMILIES IN GUYANA WHO ARE INFECTED AND AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS. WE ARE WORKING WITH THIS COMMUNITY IN LINDEN GUYANA, TO RELIEVE POVERTY. BY ALSO PROVIDING BOOKS FOR SCHOOLS, CUNSELLING AND DISTRIBUTION OF INFORMATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Guyana
Governance
- 03 December 2007: Standard registration
- 21 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 10 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY OF PEOPLE PARTICULARLY, (BUT NOT BY WAY OF EXCLUSION) FROM GUYANA LIVING WITH HIV/AIDS AND ORPHANS AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY, GREATER LONDON AND ANY WHERE ELSE IN THE WORLD. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF THE SAID COMMUNITY PARTICULARLY, (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, MULTIVITAMINS, COUNSELLING, EDUCATION, HOUSING AND ACCOMMODATION, INFORMATION AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window