EAST LONDON MOSQUE TRUST

Charity number: 1122613
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Regulatory alerts

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The East London Mosque Trust provides a range of spiritual and community services that improve the quality of life of beneficiaries visiting or residing in London. Our activities are divided into the following: Religious Services, Education and Training, Social Welfare, Community Cohesion, and Economic Development.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE EAST LONDON MOSQUE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ABDUL HAYEE MURSHAD Chair 19 September 2015
None on record
Ibrahim Ian Thompson Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Hassan Kausar Ahmed Trustee 02 September 2023
None on record
SIRAJUL ISLAM Trustee 02 September 2023
COUNCIL OF MOSQUES - TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
SHAHPORAN MASJID AND ISLAMIC CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
Mohammed Abdul Malik Trustee 02 September 2023
None on record
Rahela Choudhury Trustee 02 September 2023
None on record
Dr Abdullah Faliq Trustee 23 October 2021
EDUCATION AID FOR PALESTINIANS
Received: On time
Harun Rashid Khan Trustee 23 October 2021
THE MUSLIM COUNCIL OF BRITAIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HAAYA FOUNDATION
Received: 1 day late
SYED TOHEL AHMED Trustee 23 October 2021
MUSLIM AID
Received: On time
Salma Siddiqua Trustee 23 October 2021
None on record
Dr Mahera Ruby Trustee 02 December 2015
THE MARKFIELD INSTITUTE OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Received: On time
CITIZENS UK CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.03m £4.38m £4.39m £5.11m £5.60m
Total expenditure £3.32m £3.37m £3.58m £4.39m £4.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £15.10k £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.22m £1.18m £1.32m £1.58m £1.72m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.77m £2.00m £2.54m £2.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01m £776.54k £885.14k £945.05k £1.07m
Income - Other £130.50k £652.25k £189.74k £46.92k £47.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.19m £2.27m £2.35m £3.38m £3.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £477.07k £428.76k £511.44k £266.48k £258.94k
Expenditure - Governance £82.02k £81.66k £82.65k £105.17k £168.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £258.51k £236.97k £234.03k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £659.57k £662.85k £718.25k £738.35k £864.43k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £24.19m £24.21m £24.25m £25.40m £26.28m
Long-term investments £16.05m £16.05m £16.05m £16.10m £15.69m
Other assets £2.14m £2.92m £3.56m £2.70m £3.32m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.83m £6.63m £6.50m £7.06m £7.52m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
East London Mosque Trust
82-92 Whitechapel Road
LONDON
E1 1JQ
Phone:
02076503000