FAIZAN-E-MUSTAFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. TO TEACH HOLY QURAN TO CHILDREN OF ALL AGES. 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES. 3. TO TEACH URDU LANGUAGE TO CHILDREN OF ALL AGES AND SPECIALLY THOSE WHO WERE BORN IN THE UK. 4. TO RUN AN ADVISORY CENTRE IN LEGAL MATTERS LIKE IMMIGRATION, HOUSING AND ALSO HELP FILL IN OFFICIAL FORMS OF THOSE WHO NEED ASSISTA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 10 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Faizan Amin | Trustee | 16 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
BASHRAT MOHAMMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALIK MOHAMMED FAYAZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.18k | £88.28k | £93.14k | £90.04k | £86.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.27k | £41.80k | £66.37k | £66.79k | £76.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.27k | £4.28k | £2.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES; AND 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE SUBJECT OF ISLAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 BERTHA ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B11 2NN
- Phone:
- 07966659171
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window