Financial history LOVE IN ACTION (INTERNATIONAL)

Charity number: 1122493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £116.37k £184.77k £135.15k £146.22k £136.00k
Total expenditure £102.11k £168.32k £150.36k £144.73k £129.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A