Accounts and annual returns TRUE BELIEVERS MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1123490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 10 February 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2023 10 February 2025 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2022 31 March 2023 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2021 03 May 2022 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required