HOLY TRINITY PROPERTIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering the religious and other charitable work of Holy Trinity Church, Ripon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £14,644 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT THEW | Chair | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Crompton | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Anne Warner | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DAVID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.12k | £32.58k | £28.08k | £23.60k | £51.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.81k | £10.71k | £19.92k | £129.92k | £45.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2024 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2023 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2023 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURES DATED 9 DECEMBER 1835, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 5 NOVEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
FOR THE AUGMENTATION OF THE MAINTENANCE OR SALARY OF THE SAID MINISTER AND INCUMBENT FOR THE TIME BEING.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE RIPON
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Ure Bank Terrace
RIPON
North Yorkshire
HG4 1JG
- Phone:
- 01765604228
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window