FRIENDS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN AUSTRALIA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UWA Friends through their activities seeks to educate the public by promoting, supporting, assisting and improving the University of Western Australia (or other similar charitable institutions having the same objects), by making grants from Trust Funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
- Australia
Governance
- 12 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristy Elizabeth Duane | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Jewkes | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Barblett | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND PETER WHITTAKER NATTRASS | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE Elizabeth HOLMES A COURT MATHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.34k | £76.33k | £11.56k | £59.53k | £65.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.86k | £79.55k | £5.65k | £59.95k | £66.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/04/2011
Charitable objects
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALLOW SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS: A) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN AUSTRALIA THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPE ; AND B) THE FURTHERANCE GENERALLY OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN AUSTRALIA AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE FACILITIES WHICH IT AFFORDS; AND C) THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN AUSTRALIA OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS HAVING OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN AUSTRALIA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
265 Saunders Lane
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 0NU
- Phone:
- 07788973230
- Email:
- alumni@uwa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window