BIRDS' EDGE COUNTRYSIDE (BECSIDE) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing woodland with access for the general public and with paths suitable for wheelchair users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 11 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GODFREY STEPHEN SELLARS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MCGUCKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN MCGUCKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL TENNANT NORMANDALE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £3.25k | £3.92k | £6.15k | £6.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £3.18k | £3.92k | £6.15k | £6.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AT THE NATURE RESERVE, WOODLAND AND LAKE ON FIELD 8169, BIRDS' EDGE LANE, BIRDS EDGE, HUDDERSFIELD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR WITH ACCESS FOR WHEELCHAIR USERS.
Area of benefit
HUDDERSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
33a Greenfield Road
Holmfirth
HD9 2LA
- Phone:
- 01484684797
- Email:
- tamarisk33@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window